|
09/24/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 549, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6446.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4649.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1263.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|