California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB50 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill September 1, 2015
Bill May 21, 2015
Bill May 13, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015