California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB503 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2015

Amended

Bill July 7, 2015
Bill March 23, 2015