LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB509
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB509
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB509
Compare Versions
AB509 Chaptered October 7, 2015
AB509 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB509 Amended June 23, 2015
AB509 Amended April 23, 2015
AB509 Amended March 26, 2015
AB509 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB509 Chaptered October 7, 2015
AB509 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB509 Amended June 23, 2015
AB509 Amended April 23, 2015
AB509 Amended March 26, 2015
AB509 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare