California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB515 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Amended

Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 8, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015