Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 14. Noes 23. Page 5569.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Runner.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 20. Page 2647.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Runner. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2648.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 3. Page 1590.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|