Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on unfinished business file, concurrence pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5248.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mendoza.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 1141.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|