Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2015 | In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2015 | Read first time. To print. |