|
09/21/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 292, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 2154.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 13. Page 1382.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/01/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|