LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB532
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB532
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB532
Compare Versions
AB532 Chaptered October 2, 2015
AB532 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB532 Amended September 3, 2015
AB532 Amended August 31, 2015
AB532 Amended May 20, 2015
AB532 Amended April 20, 2015
AB532 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB532 Chaptered October 2, 2015
AB532 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB532 Amended September 3, 2015
AB532 Amended August 31, 2015
AB532 Amended May 20, 2015
AB532 Amended April 20, 2015
AB532 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare