California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB545 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015
Bill March 19, 2015