California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB549 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill July 13, 2015
Bill June 30, 2015
Bill June 16, 2015