California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB551 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill July 15, 2015
Bill May 14, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015