08/10/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 150, Statutes of 2015. | |||
08/10/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 08/03/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1875.). | ||
Senate | 06/17/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 16). | ||
Senate | 06/04/2015 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 554.) | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 13). | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2015 | Read first time. To print. |