Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 12. Page 1583.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/03/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|