BILL NUMBER: AB 563AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 11, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 4, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 21, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Lopez (Coauthors: Assembly Members Brown and Hadley) FEBRUARY 24, 2015 An act to add and repeal Section 4648.7 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 563, as amended, Lopez. Developmental services. The Lanterman Developmental Disabilities Services Act requires the State Department of Developmental Services to contract with regional centers to provide services and supports to individuals with developmental disabilities. Under existing law, the regional centers purchase needed services for individuals with developmental disabilities through approved service providers or arrange for those services through other publicly funded agencies. The services and supports to be provided to a regional center consumer are contained in an individual program plan or individualized family service plan, developed in accordance with prescribed requirements. This bill would require the State Department of Developmental Services and the California Department ofAgingAging, in consultation with certain stakeholders, to develop best practices for providing culturally competent services and supports to aging consumers with developmental and intellectual disabilities, as specified. The bill would require the State Department of Developmental Services to conduct a 2-year pilot program that implements those best practices in 3 regional centers that reflect the geographic diversity of California and, after the conclusion of the pilot program, by January 1, 2020, submit a report, as specified, evaluating the pilot program to the Legislature. These provisions would be repealed January 1, 2021. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 4648.7 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: 4648.7. (a) (1) By January 1, 2017, the department and the California Department of Aging shall develop best practices for providing culturally competent services and supports to aging consumers with developmental and intellectual disabilities. In developing the best practices, the department and the California Department of Aging shall consult stakeholders, including, but not limited to, individuals with developmental disabilities, family members of individuals with developmental disabilities, service provider agency representatives, regional center representatives, labor organizations representing employees of regional centers, and the staff of appropriate policy committees of the Legislature. (2) The best practices developed pursuant to this subdivision shall include, but not be limited to, both of the following: (A) Regional center protocols to enhance communication with, and improve service delivery to, aging consumers with developmental and intellectual disabilities. (B) Identification of services for inclusion in a consumer's individual program plan, as appropriate, that can better support aging consumers with developmental and intellectual disabilities. (b) The department shall conduct a two-year pilot program that implements the best practices developed pursuant to subdivision (a) in three regional centers that reflect the geographic diversity of California. (c) (1) After the conclusion of the pilot program, the department shall submit a report to the Legislature evaluating the pilot program conducted pursuant to subdivision (b) by January 1, 2020, which shall include a determination of whether the best practices implemented in the pilot program should be implemented statewide. (2) The report required by this subdivision shall be submitted in accordance with Section 9795 of the Government Code. (d) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2021, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2021, deletes or extends that date.