|
09/29/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 6463.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 5289.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c) .
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 29. Page 1625.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1369.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|