|
08/07/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 134, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1784.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1550.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|