|
10/05/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 501, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2915.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2916.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2484.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1987.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1631.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|