California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB577 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Amended

Bill July 6, 2015
Bill June 17, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015