LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB58
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB58
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB58
Compare Versions
AB58 Amended July 9, 2015
AB58 Amended May 28, 2015
AB58 Amended April 20, 2015
AB58 Amended March 26, 2015
AB58 Introduced December 2, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB58 Amended July 9, 2015
AB58 Amended May 28, 2015
AB58 Amended April 20, 2015
AB58 Amended March 26, 2015
AB58 Introduced December 2, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare