California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB580 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Amended

Bill June 24, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill May 6, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015