Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3475.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|