Assembly | 01/05/2016 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 09/10/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2015 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2015 | Read first time. To print. |