California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB598 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill January 21, 2016
Bill January 14, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016