LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB606
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB606
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB606
Compare Versions
AB606 Chaptered October 9, 2015
AB606 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB606 Amended August 25, 2015
AB606 Amended August 17, 2015
AB606 Amended May 12, 2015
AB606 Amended April 13, 2015
AB606 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB606 Chaptered October 9, 2015
AB606 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB606 Amended August 25, 2015
AB606 Amended August 17, 2015
AB606 Amended May 12, 2015
AB606 Amended April 13, 2015
AB606 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare