Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1561.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|