California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB622 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2015

Amended

Bill June 18, 2015
Bill April 27, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015