Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.) In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2015 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 28). | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 15. Noes 4.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2015 | Read first time. To print. |