California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB625 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2015

Amended

Bill July 1, 2015
Bill June 17, 2015
Bill May 6, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015