California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB626 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 8, 2016
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015