Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 1334.) | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 28). | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2015 | Read first time. To print. |