Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1793.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/16/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/15/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|