California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB630 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2015

Amended

Bill July 1, 2015
Bill April 27, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015