LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB632
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB632
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB632
Compare Versions
AB632 Chaptered August 11, 2015
AB632 Enrolled July 8, 2015
AB632 Amended June 8, 2015
AB632 Amended March 26, 2015
AB632 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB632 Chaptered August 11, 2015
AB632 Enrolled July 8, 2015
AB632 Amended June 8, 2015
AB632 Amended March 26, 2015
AB632 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare