Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2015 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2015 | Read first time. To print. |