Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1380.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|