|
09/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 600, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 5. Page 6466.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 5421.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lara.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 1777.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|