|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 697, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2279.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1390.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|