Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2015 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 12/16/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 15. | ||
Assembly | 12/15/2014 | Introduced. To print. |