Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 29. Page 1846.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|