California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB646 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2015

Amended

Bill July 8, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015