Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1714.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|