California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB652 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill June 16, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015