Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2016
|
Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1089.) (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|