California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB658 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 16, 2015

Amended

Bill June 19, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015