|
07/13/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 76, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2141.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1548.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1541.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|