LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB662
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB662
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB662
Compare Versions
AB662 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB662 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB662 Amended September 3, 2015
AB662 Amended August 31, 2015
AB662 Amended July 7, 2015
AB662 Amended June 1, 2015
AB662 Amended April 28, 2015
AB662 Amended April 14, 2015
AB662 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB662 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB662 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB662 Amended September 3, 2015
AB662 Amended August 31, 2015
AB662 Amended July 7, 2015
AB662 Amended June 1, 2015
AB662 Amended April 28, 2015
AB662 Amended April 14, 2015
AB662 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare