07/02/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 38, Statutes of 2015. | |||
07/02/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 06/23/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1490.). | ||
Senate | 06/10/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2015 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8). | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1446.) | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2015 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 6). | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2015 | Read first time. To print. |