California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB664 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill June 25, 2015